Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Muñoz de la Cueva, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660²Born
1 Oct 171757.7AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
5 Dec 171757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
2 Jun 172868.4DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Muñoz de la Cueva
Bishop Juan Muñoz de la Cueva O.SS.T. (born 1660, died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmedina

  • a bishop for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,067
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 35, Number 116
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast