Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles de Marillac

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1550AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
24 Mar 1557AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
2 Dec 1560DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Marillac
Archbishop Charles de Marillac (died ) Archbishop of Vienne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329, and Page 333
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 43*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast