Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zakariás Mossóczy

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
15 May 157331.3AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
27 Oct 157836.8AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
7 Oct 158341.7AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
10 Apr 158644.2DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zakariás Mossóczy (VIAF: 84285235)
Bishop Zakariás Mossóczy (born 1542, died ) Bishop of Nitra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325, and Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018