Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mannus Morula

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1462AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
5 Jun 1472AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
2 Feb 1487DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mannus Morula
Bishop Mannus Morula (died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 170, and Page 81
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1462, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast