Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leone Morinelli, O.S.B.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1936 Born
13 Nov 195620.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 May 196024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 201377.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
14 Dec 201377.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leone Morinelli
Father Leone Morinelli O.S.B. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Abbey of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast