Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Moretti, B.

Superior Emeritus of Afghanistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1938 BornRecanati, Italy
9 Mar 196324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
16 May 200263.5AppointedSuperior of Afghanistan
2014¹75.1RetiredSuperior of Afghanistan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Moretti:
Father Giuseppe Moretti B. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Afghanistan

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Afghanistan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2015, Page 1,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 May 2015