Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea da Montecchio

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1431AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
18 Aug 1434AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
29 Oct 1434AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
1454²DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea da Montecchio
Bishop Andrea da Montecchio (died 1454) Bishop of Osimo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 117, and Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast