Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stjepan Mlakić, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1884Born
1915²30.1ProfessedMember of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Oct 193853.9AppointedPrefect of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan
21 Oct 195065.9ResignedPrefect of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan
26 Jan 195166.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stjepan Mlakić
Father Stjepan Mlakić F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Bahr el-Gebel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFojnica, Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
Death PlaceCairo

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast