Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Minutoli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
1382²AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
1383²AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
Sep 1389³AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
18 Dec 1389Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 1389AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
13 Feb 1400ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1405²AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
2 Jul 1409AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
17 Jun 1412DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Minutoli:
Enrico Cardinal Minutoli (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 22.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 21 Feb 2014