Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Jean Miles

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510²BornLoèche-les-Bains
22 Jun 155040.4SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
27 Aug 155040.6ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
19 Feb 157262.1DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Miles:
Abbot Jean Miles (born 1510, died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015