Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksandar Ignacije Mikulić Brokunovečki

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1649BornMarocha
16 Apr 167223.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 168536.1SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
24 Nov 168738.7ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
1688¹38.8Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
16 Jan 168838.8SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
11 Oct 168839.6ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
11 May 169445.2DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksandar Ignacije Mikulić Brokunovečki:
Bishop Aleksandar Ignacije Mikulić Brokunovečki (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 381, and Page 421
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015