Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Martinho Michler, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1901Born
22 Aug 192625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
19 May 194846.7SelectedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
26 Jun 194846.8ConfirmedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
196967.3DiedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Martinho Michler
Abbot Martinho Michler O.S.B. (born , died 1969) Abbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavensburg

  • a priest for 42.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast