Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Michiel

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1446¹Born
21 Nov 146822.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Nov 146822.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
1470¹24.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
18 Mar 147125.2AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
1484¹38.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
14 Mar 149145.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
10 Oct 149145.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
31 Aug 149246.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Jan 149751.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
10 Apr 150357.2DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Michiel
Giovanni Cardinal Michiel (born 1446, died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 34.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1468
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 265
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1471, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast