Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Michele, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ales (Uselli), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1444AppointedBishop of Ales (Uselli), Italy
1 Oct 1454DiedBishop of Ales (Uselli), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Michele
Bishop Bernardo Michele O.P. (died ) Bishop of Ales (Uselli)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 261
  • b: CB, 19 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast