Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Mesmer

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1671Born
10 Apr 174775.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 174776.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
22 Sep 174978.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
20 Jun 176089.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Mesmer
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Mesmer (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast