Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Mesa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain

Bishop of Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470Born
7 Jun 150838.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Forli, Italy
7 Jun 150838.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Trinopolis
10 Sep 151545.6AppointedBishop of Elne, France
20 Feb 152151.1AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
1524²54.0DiedBishop of Elne, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Mesa
Bishop Bernardo de Mesa O.P. (born 1470, died 1524) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 319
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 25, Number 65
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 35, Number 155
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1508, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 May 2018

Quantcast