Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Athanasius (Ludwig) Merkle, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus

Titular See: (Ord. Cist. di S. Croce)(Nossa Senhora da Santa Cruz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1888Born
20 Jun 190719.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
4 Aug 191325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
27 Dec 195062.6AppointedAbbot
1971²82.6ResignedAbbot
5 Jun 198092.0DiedAbbot Emeritus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Athanasius (Ludwig) Merkle
Abbot Athanasius (Ludwig) Merkle O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBayersried, Germany
Death PlaceItaporanga

  • a priest for 66.8 years

Source(s):
  • bd/bp: CB, 7 Aug 2015
  • qoci/prof: CB, 16 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017