Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Mellini

Deceased

Bishop of Urbino

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1405BornRoma
27 Apr 146862.9AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
18 Dec 147671.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Dec 147671.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
24 Jul 147873.1DiedBishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Mellini:
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Mellini (born , died ) Bishop of Urbino

  • a cardinal for 1.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013