Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludwig von Meißen

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1341BornWartburg
16 Mar 135716.0AppointedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
5 Jun 136625.2AppointedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Apr 137433.1AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
1379¹37.8ResignedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
28 Apr 138140.1AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
17 Feb 138240.9DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwig von Meißen (VIAF: 23000611)
Archbishop Ludwig von Meißen (born , died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 322, and Page 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 127, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Jun 2016