Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Filippo Mei, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornLucca
9 Feb 163532.1ProfessedPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
8 Jul 165855.5AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
27 Apr 166461.3DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Filippo Mei:
Bishop Carlo Filippo Mei B. (born 1603, died ) Bishop of Bisignano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 115
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015