Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Meehan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Gambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1873Born
1901²27.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
1904²30.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Oct 193158.5AppointedSuperior of Gambia
194672.7ResignedSuperior of Gambia
15 Sep 195481.4DiedSuperior Emeritus of Gambia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Meehan
Father John Meehan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Gambia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLifford, Co. Donegal, Ireland

  • a priest for 50.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast