Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John McCaffrey

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Charleston, South Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1806Born
1831²24.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Mar 183831.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 185750.3AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
May 1857²50.6ResignedBishop-Elect of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
26 Sep 188175.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John McCaffrey (VIAF: 46662443)
Father John McCaffrey (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmmitsburg, MD

  • a priest for 43.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017