Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bélát Mayer

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1905SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
11 Dec 1905ConfirmedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
13 Mar 1906ResignedBishop-Elect of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Bélát Mayer:
Priest Bélát Mayer Former Bishop-Elect of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1905

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013