Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Rabanus Maurus, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
776¹Born
801²25.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Dec 81438.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jun 84771.4AppointedBishop of Mainz, Germany
26 Jun 84771.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
4 Feb 85680.0DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Rabanus Maurus (VIAF: 95147534)
Bishop St. Rabanus Maurus O.S.B. (born 776, died ) Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Death PlaceWinkel

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 13 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017