Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Paolo Mastrilli

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1652Born
22 Sep 167422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 167624.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 170351.4AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
7 Apr 171360.7DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Paolo Mastrilli
Bishop Pier Paolo Mastrilli (born , died ) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosarno

  • a priest for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 276
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast