Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Mastellone

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1642³Born
25 Jul 166926.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 166926.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 168542.4AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
Jun 1721³78.5DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mastellone
Bishop Giuseppe Mastellone (born , died Jun 1721) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlano de Sorrento

  • a priest for 51.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast