Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Mascall, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jul 1404AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 1404Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 1416DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Mascall:
Bishop Robert Mascall O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 12.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 463
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013