Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Capri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1460SelectedBishop of Capri, Italy
25 Jun 1460ConfirmedBishop of Capri, Italy
20 Oct 1469AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
1473¹ResignedBishop of Capri, Italy
1474²DiedBishop Emeritus of Capri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Martino
Bishop Martino (died 1474) Bishop Emeritus of Capri

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 31 Aug 2018

Quantcast