Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Martínez del Villar

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1640Born
17 Dec 169656.0AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
1697²56.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
8 Aug 169958.6DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Martínez del Villar
Bishop José Martínez del Villar (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMunébrega

  • a bishop for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 113
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 240, Number 1,484
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast