Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hipólito Martínez y Martínez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lixian [Lichow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1882Born
19 Sep 189715.1EnteredMember of Order of St. Augustine
8 Nov 189816.3ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
5 Jul 190522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
16 Jan 193249.5AppointedPrefect of Lixian [Lichow], China
3 Dec 196280.4DiedPrefect of Lixian [Lichow], China

MicroData Summary for Hipólito Martínez y Martínez
Father Hipólito Martínez y Martínez O.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Lixian [Lichow]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePola de Laviana, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain
Ordained PriestLa Vid, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain
Death PlaceConvent, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain

  • a priest for 57.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • prof/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast