Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Charles de Mari, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1633BornGenova
1653²19.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
1 Apr 168652.8AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
30 Apr 170470.9ResignedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
28 Sep 171279.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Charles de Mari:
Bishop Jean Charles de Mari C.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Accia and Mariana

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 256
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015