Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Mariani

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1644AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
14 Aug 1644Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
30 Jul 1665DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pietro Mariani:
Bishop Pietro Mariani (died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013