Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Margarita, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1800BornFrancavilla
18 Feb 182626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
16 Nov 185050.8SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
17 Feb 185151.0ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
30 Mar 185151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
15 Apr 188888.2DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Margarita:
Bishop Luigi Margarita C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013