Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus Manteuffel-Arnhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1519AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
26 Nov 1521SucceededBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
27 Jan 1544DiedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany

MicroData Summary for Erasmus Manteuffel-Arnhausen
Bishop Erasmus Manteuffel-Arnhausen (died ) Bishop of Kammin (Camin)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,519, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast