Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Manrique de Lara y Solís

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1471Born
6 Sep 149928.6AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
18 Aug 151645.6AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
31 Aug 152352.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
22 Feb 153160.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Apr 153160.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
12 Jul 153261.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
28 Sep 153867.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Manrique de Lara y Solís
Alfonso Cardinal Manrique de Lara y Solís (born 1471, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegura de León

  • a cardinal for 7.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Feb 1531
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast