Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Manero, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1655SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
31 Jan 1656ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
5 Dec 1659DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manero:
Bishop Pedro Manero O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 338
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 187, Number 1,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013