Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Inácio Martinez Madrid, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1902Born
20 Mar 192623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
13 Jun 193027.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Jun 193027.9AppointedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
16 Mar 194239.6DiedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Inácio Martinez Madrid
Father Inácio Martinez Madrid O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate of Lábrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaños de Valdearados, Spain

  • a priest for 15.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 23 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast