Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo de Magalhćes e Avelar

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1754³BornLamego
31 Dec 177723.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 181560.8SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
29 Apr 181661.4ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
29 Jun 181661.5Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
16 May 183378.4DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo de Magalhćes e Avelar:
Bishop Joćo de Magalhćes e Avelar (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013