Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop García Martínez de Baamonde

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1437AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
6 Apr 1440AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
10 Nov 1445AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
27 Mar 1447AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
1475¹DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for García Martínez de Baamonde
Bishop García Martínez de Baamonde (died 1475) Bishop of Lugo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180, and Page 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 99, and Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast