Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roderick MacLean

Deceased

Bishop of The Isles (Sodor), Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
30 Aug 154949.6AppointedBishop of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
5 Mar 155050.1AppointedBishop of The Isles (Sodor), Scotland, Great Britain
1552²52.0Ordained BishopBishop of The Isles (Sodor), Scotland, Great Britain
1553²53.0DiedBishop of The Isles (Sodor), Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roderick MacLean
Bishop Roderick MacLean (born 1500, died 1553) Bishop of The Isles (Sodor)

EventPlace
Birth Placenear Loch Ness

  • a bishop for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 170, and Page 302
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 29*
  • b/ob/d: CB, 1 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 May 2018

Quantcast