Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Luxemburg-Ligny

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1365AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
28 Apr 1371AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
4 Apr 1373DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Luxemburg-Ligny
Archbishop Johann von Luxemburg-Ligny (died ) Archbishop of Mainz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 322, and Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast