Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Nikolaus von Luxemburg

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1322²BornPrag
7 Jan 134927.0AppointedBishop of Naumburg, Germany
22 Oct 135028.8AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
30 Jul 135836.5DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus von Luxemburg (VIAF: 286461172)
Patriarch Nikolaus von Luxemburg (born 1322, died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 374, and Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 30 Jan 2016