Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Émile Lutz, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1853Born
23 Dec 187623.9Ordained PriestPriest
1877²23.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Apr 188936.2AppointedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria
17 Apr 189542.2DiedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Émile Lutz
Father Joseph Émile Lutz C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDauendorf, France
Death PlaceMerville, France

  • a priest for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast