Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor von Ludinghausen Wolff

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1662Born
25 Apr 170037.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
14 Mar 170138.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
14 Mar 170138.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
21 Jul 171047.8SucceededBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
10 Nov 171048.1AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
9 May 171249.6DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

MicroData Summary for Teodor von Ludinghausen Wolff
Bishop Teodor von Ludinghausen Wolff (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisena

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156, and Page 390
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 408
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast