Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Maria Cardinal Lucini, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666Born
9 Sep 174377.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174377.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
17 Jan 174579.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Lucini
Luigi Maria Cardinal Lucini O.P. (born 1666, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast