Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Lucchetti

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1623Born
21 Sep 164622.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 168662.4AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
Feb 1707³83.3DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Lucchetti
Bishop Domenico Lucchetti (born , died Feb 1707) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAliano

  • a priest for 60.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,686, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast