Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Lubrański

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1456¹Born
5 Mar 149842.2AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
22 Oct 149842.8AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
22 May 152064.4DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Lubrański:
Bishop Jan Lubrański (died ) Bishop of Poznań

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 217, and Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013