Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hughes Cardinal de Loubenx de Verdalle, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1531BornLoubenx, France
18 Dec 158756.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158856.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
4 May 159564.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)

MicroData Summary for Hughes de Loubenx de Verdalle:
Cardinal Hughes de Loubenx de Verdalle O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)

  • a cardinal for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013