Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father François de Lorraine-Chaligny

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1599BornFougères
162324.0AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
11 Jul 166162.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Verdun, France
10 Jun 167172.4DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for François de Lorraine-Chaligny:
Priest François de Lorraine-Chaligny (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Verdun

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013