Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Louis de Lorraine, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Condom


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1658SelectedBishop of Condom, France
10 Nov 1659ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
Mar 1660³Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
1 Jun 1668DiedBishop of Condom, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Louis de Lorraine:
Bishop Charles-Louis de Lorraine O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Condom

  • a bishop for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015